CA SB724 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14536, 14549.2, 14571.6, 14571.8, 14581, and 14585 of, and to add and repeal Sections 14572.3 and 14575.2 of, the Public Resources Code, relating to beverage containers, making an appropriation therefor, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
The California Beverage Container Recycling and Litter Reduction Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | May 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 844.) (April 24). |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on EQ. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 14536 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14549.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14571.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14571.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14572.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14575.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14581 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 14585 | Amended Code | Citation Text |