CA SB729 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-31 - August 31 set for first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 21 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-31 - August 31 set for first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation.
Pending: Assembly Labor and Employment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 2699.7 to the Labor Code, relating to employment.
Title
Meal and rest breaks: remote work.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB729 Portantino (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Assembly - Be re-referred to the Committee on [Labor and Employment] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB729 Portantino (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-31 | Assembly | August 31 set for first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(b) suspended. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 20). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. |
2020-06-26 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1193.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1108.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 650.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 2699.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |