CA SB739 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18302, and to amend, add, and repeal Section 3022, of the Elections Code, relating to elections, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Elections: vote by mail ballots and false or misleading information.
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] | Asm. Kevin Mullin [D] | Asm. Robert Rivas [D] |
Sen. Tom Umberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB739 Stern et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 739 Stern Third Reading Urgency By Mullin (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB739 Stern et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 739 Stern Third Reading Urgency By Mullin (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB739 Stern et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 109, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-18 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-09-01 | Senate | Urgency clause adopted. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 5365.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-21 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-07-28 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 27). |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2020-07-08 | Assembly | July 13 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on E. & R. |
2020-01-27 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3153.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3142.) (January 23). |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Set for hearing January 23. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | January 21 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Set for hearing January 21. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3087.) (January 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-01-07 | Senate | Set for hearing January 14. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Elections Code | 18302 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Elections Code | 3022 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |