CA SB752 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 598, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 598, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4022.5, 4040.5, 4059.5, 4100, 4160, 4200.4, 4331, and 4400 of, and to add Sections 4022.6 and 4053.2 to, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Pharmacy: designated representative-reverse distributors.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-09-14 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar SB752 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 752 Stone Senate Third Reading By WALDRON (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 752 Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB752 Stone (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-11 - Assembly - SB 752 Stone Senate Third Reading By WALDRON (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-24 - Assembly - SB 752 Stone Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-19 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB752 Stone (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 598, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-21 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m. |
2017-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2906.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3165.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-07 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-31 | Assembly | Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered transmitted to the Senate. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-08-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2770.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-07-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19). |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2017-05-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 955.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 913.) (May 1). |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 1. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 727.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Set for hearing April 17. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4022.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4022.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4040.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4053.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4059.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4200.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4331 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4400 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 25207.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |