CA SB754 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 858, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 858, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 5100 of the Civil Code, and to amend Section 7522 of the Corporations Code, relating to common interest developments.
Title
Common interest developments: board members: election by acclamation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB754 Moorlach (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB754 Moorlach (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 754 Moorlach Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB754 Moorlach (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB754 Moorlach (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-13 - Assembly - SB 754 Moorlach Senate Third Reading By Petrie-Norris (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB754 Moorlach (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-12 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 858, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-12 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-20 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-09-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3600.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-13 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 3549.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-07-10 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-07-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on H. & C.D. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1160.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 907.) (April 30). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 30. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 775.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Set for hearing April 22. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HOUSING. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on HOUSING and JUD. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 5100 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 7522 | Amended Code | Citation Text |