CA SB756 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-03 - Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 47602.1 to, and to add and repeal Section 47602.2 of, the Education Code, relating to charter schools.
Title
Charter schools: moratorium.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Senate | Died on file pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Durazo. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1108.) (May 16). |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-13 | Senate | May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 3. Page 797.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2019-02-25 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 47602.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 47602.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |