CA SB76 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 52, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 52, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 14002, 41206.01, and 41206.03 of, and to add Section 41207.47 to, the Education Code, relating to education finance, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Education finance: constitutional minimum funding obligation: inflation and cost-of-living adjustments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 76 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB76 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB76 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB76 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB76 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 52, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1595.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2299.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.) |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 663.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 14002 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 41206.01 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 41206.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 41207.47 | New Code | See Bill Text |