CA SB785 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 469, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on October 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-02 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 469, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 2301 of the Fish and Game Code, to amend Section 66801 of, and to repeal Section 50370 of, the Government Code, to amend Sections 614, 615, 5012, 10211, 31013, and 31116 of the Public Resources Code, and to amend Sections 38505, 38506, 38600, 38601, 38602, 38603, and 38604 of the Vehicle Code, relating to public resources.
Title
Public resources: parklands, freshwater resources, and coastal resources: off-highway motor vehicles: public lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB785 N.R. & W. (Stern) Concurrence (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 785 N.R. & W. Senate Third Reading By FRIEDMAN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB785 N.R. & W (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 785 N.R. & W. Senate Third Reading By FRIEDMAN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources] (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Special Consent SB785 N.R. & W (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-06 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-02 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 469, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-02 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-19 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2870.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3344.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-21 | Assembly | August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-24 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on W., P., & W. and NAT. RES. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1281.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1109.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 778.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 11. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Fish and Game Code | 2301 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 50370 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 66801 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 10211 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 31013 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 31116 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5012 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 614 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 615 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38505 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38506 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38600 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38601 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38603 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 38604 | Amended Code | Citation Text |