CA SB789 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 258, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-05 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 258, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 53639 of the Government Code, and to amend Sections 2611.5, 2635, 4675, 4717, and 5097.2 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to local government.
Title
Local government: administration.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Senate - Special Consent SB789 GOV. & F. (McGuire) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - Assembly - SB 789 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB789 GOV. & F (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-11 - Assembly - SB 789 GOV.& F. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-03 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB789 GOV. & F (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-05 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 258, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-05 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2241.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-19 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-07-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2627.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-07-05 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 925.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 847.) (April 24). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 21. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 53639 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 2611.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 2635 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 4675 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 4717 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 5097.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |