CA SB790 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-20 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 18622.5 and 19311 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation.
Title
Income taxes: partnerships: audit adjustments: elections.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-30 - Senate - Special Consent SB790 GOV. & F (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 790 GOV.& F. Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB790 GOV. & F (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-22 - Assembly - SB 790 GOV.& F. Senate Third Reading By BURKE (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB790 GOV. & F (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-20 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-20 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2328.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-27 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2813.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-15 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-07-09 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | June 17 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1005.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 847.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 24. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2019-03-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 21. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 18622.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19311 | Amended Code | Citation Text |