CA SB794 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - August 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-03 - August 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Reconsideration granted.
Pending: Assembly Governmental Organization Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8593.3 and 8593.4 of, and to add Section 8593.5 to, the Government Code, and to amend Section 10850.9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to emergency services.
Title
Emergency services: telecommunications.
Sponsors
Sen. Hannah-Beth Jackson [D] | Sen. Henry Stern [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Sen. Cathleen Galgiani [D] |
Asm. James Gallagher [R] | Sen. Monique Limon [D] | Asm. Christy Smith [D] | Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB794 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB794 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 3. Noes 0.) Reconsideration granted. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3683.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Coms. on E., U. & C. and JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 3524.) (May 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2020-03-20 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | March 10 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Set for hearing March 10. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on G.O., E., U. & C., and JUD. |
2020-01-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 6. |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 8593.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8593.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 8593.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 10850.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |