CA SB8 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 5008.10 to the Public Resources Code, relating to parks.
Title
State parks: state beaches: smoking ban.
Sponsors
Sen. Steve Glazer [D] | Asm. Marc Levine [D] | Asm. Steven Choi [R] | Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D] |
Asm. Mark Stone [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB8 Glazer et al. Concurrence (Y: 29 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 8 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Levine (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB8 Glazer et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Assembly - SB 8 Glazer Senate Third Reading By Levine (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB8 Glazer et al (Y: 28 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 761, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-18 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2841.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 3260.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2019-09-03 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 4.) (August 30). |
2019-08-30 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2019-06-26 | Assembly | June 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 3.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2019-05-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 1242.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 1086.) (May 16). |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | April 8 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Set for hearing April 8. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 332.) (March 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Set for hearing March 12. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2018-12-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5008.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |