CA SB803 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 1.4 (commencing with Section 14045.10) to Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Mental health services: peer support specialist certification.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 803 Beall Senate Third Reading By Arambula (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB803 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB803 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB803 Beall et al. Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB803 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 150, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 1.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5459.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 57. Noes 15. Page 5408.) |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Joint Rule 61(b)(17) suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 16. Page 5275.) |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 4). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3817.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3766.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3533.) (May 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Set for hearing May 13. |
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 8. |
2020-01-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14045.10 | New Code | See Bill Text |