CA SB810 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-0)
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died on third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - Died on third reading.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Division 115.5 (commencing with Section 140000) to the Health and Safety Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Single-payer health care coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB810 Leno (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB810 Leno Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-26 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB810 Leno Reconsider (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | Died on third reading. | |
2012-01-26 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 15. Page 2724.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2724.) | |
2012-01-23 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-01-19 | Set for hearing January 19. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 2686.) (January 19). | |
2012-01-17 | Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-01-12 | Set for hearing January 17. | |
2011-05-23 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-05-20 | Set for hearing May 23. | |
2011-05-19 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-11 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-05-10 | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-05-09 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 886.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-26 | Set for hearing May 4. | |
2011-04-25 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-03-31 | Set for hearing April 27. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and RLS. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 140000 | New Code | See Bill Text |