CA SB810 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Sections 17053.58, 17053.59,17053.60, 17053.65, 17053.66, 23660, 23665, and 23666 of the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Franchise Tax Board: tax credit certificates for exporters and importers: income tax credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Curren Price [D] | Sen. Ted Lieu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Senate | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Set for hearing April 16. |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 9. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Read first time. |
2013-02-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 25. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 64140 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.58 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.59 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.60 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.65 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17053.66 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23660 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23665 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 23666 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |