CA SB810 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 397, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-09-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 397, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5204, 12524, 12804.2, 12810.2, 14611, 14900.1, 27316, 27316.5, and 40802 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation.
Title
Transportation: omnibus bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-09-07 - Senate - Special Consent Calendar # SB810 T.&H (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 810 T. & H. Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB810 T.&H (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-05 - Assembly - SB 810 T. & H. Senate Third Reading By FRAZIER (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-08-23 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-10 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-15 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd SB810 T.&H (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-30 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 397, Statutes of 2017. | |
2017-09-30 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2017-09-12 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2017-09-07 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2584.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-09-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2966.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-28 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. |
2017-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-08-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23). |
2017-07-12 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-07-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 10). |
2017-06-28 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-06-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2017-05-16 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | May 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 8. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Vehicle Code | 12524 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12804.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 12810.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 14611 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 14900.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 27316 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 27316.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 40802 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 5204 | Amended Code | Citation Text |