CA SB810 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 26163 to the Business and Professions Code, to amend Sections 100000, 100002, 100004, 100010, 100014, 100024, 100028, 100032, 100034, 100038, and 100043 of, to amend the heading of Title 21 (commencing with Section 100000) of, and to add Section 100033 to, the Government Code, to add Section 19567 to, and to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 19285) to Chapter 5 of Part 10.2 of Division 2 of, the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Section 1095 of, and to repeal Section 1088.9 of, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to retirement savings, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement savings.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB810 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-06-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-06-18AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-18SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-03-10SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-03-09SenateOrdered to second reading.
2020-03-09SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 3366.)
2020-01-22SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2020-01-13SenateRead first time.
2020-01-13SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12.
2020-01-10SenateIntroduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Business and Professions Code26163New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code100000Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100002Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100004Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100010Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100014Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100024Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100028Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100032Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100033New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code100034Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100038Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code100043Amended CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1088.9Repealed CodeCitation Text
Revenue and Taxation Code1095Amended CodeCitation Text
Unemployment Insurance Code19567New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback