CA SB811 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4003 and 4004 of, and to add Section 1026.2 to, the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to unemployment benefits, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Unemployment compensation benefits: COVID-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB811 B. & F.R (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 3735.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 3366.) |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Unemployment Insurance Code | 1026.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 4003 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 4004 | Amended Code | Citation Text |