CA SB849 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 25 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 25 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48205 of the Education Code, relating to pupil attendance.
Title
Pupil attendance: excused absences: mental or behavioral health.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Read first time. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 12. |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48205 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB849 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB849 |