CA SB850 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 510.5 to the Labor Code, relating to private employment.
Title
Work hours: scheduling.
Sponsors
Sen. Connie Leyva [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 13. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 510.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB850 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB850 |