CA SB854 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 14 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-14 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 712.1 to the Fish and Game Code, to amend Sections 49012, 49013, and 49014 of, and to add Sections 49015 and 49016 to, the Food and Agricultural Code, to amend Sections 4216.6, 4216.19, 27338, and 51283 of the Government Code, to amend Section 116365 of, and to add Sections 39603.1, 43019.1, 43019.2, and 43019.3 to, the Health and Safety Code, to amend Sections 2774, 4213.05, 5010.6, 5010.7, 5093.54, 5093.545, 5093.56, 5854, 8560, 8610, 14581, 25301, and 25302 of, to add Sections 2774.2.5, 3113, and 14536.3 to, to add Chapter 1.78 (commencing with Section 5097.999) to Division 5 of, to add Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 14420) to Division 12 of, to add and repeal Section 14549.2 of, and to repeal Sections 5010.6.5, 5093.548, and 5093.549 of the Public Resources Code, to amend Sections 305, 309.5, 400, 454.5, 591, 792.5, 984.5, 2827, and 5900 of, to add Sections 910.6 and 5012 to, and to repeal Chapter 6 (commencing with Section 5001) of Division 2 of, the Public Utilities Code, and to amend Sections 6161 and 12987.5 of, and to amend and repeal Section 12986 of, the Water Code, and to amend Section 3 of Chapter 421 of the Statutes of 2017, relating to public resources, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public resources.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-14 - Assembly - SB 854 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SB854 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB854 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-14SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-06-14SenateUnanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file.
2018-06-14SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-06-14AssemblyRead third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-06-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 63 suspended.
2018-06-14AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-06-14AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-06-14AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended.
2018-06-11AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11.)
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Food and Agricultural Code49012Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code49013Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code49014Amended CodeCitation Text
Food and Agricultural Code49015New CodeSee Bill Text
Food and Agricultural Code49016New CodeSee Bill Text
Fish and Game Code712.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code27338Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code4216.19Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code4216.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code51283Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code116365Amended CodeCitation Text
Health and Safety Code39603.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code43019.1New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code43019.2New CodeSee Bill Text
Health and Safety Code43019.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code14536.3New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code14549.2Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code14581Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code25301Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code25302Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code2774Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code2774.2.5New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code3113New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Resources Code4213.05Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5010.6Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5010.7Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5093.54Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5093.545Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5093.56Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code5854Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code8560Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Resources Code8610Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code2827Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code305Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code309.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code400Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code454.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code5001Repealed CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code5012New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code5900Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code591Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code792.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Public Utilities Code910.6New CodeSee Bill Text
Public Utilities Code984.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code12986Repealed CodeCitation Text
Water Code12987.5Amended CodeCitation Text
Water Code6161Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback