CA SB854 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-24 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-24 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1367.207 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.204 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: substance use disorders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-24 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-15 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 14. |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1367.207 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.204 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB854 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB854 |