CA SB860 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 231, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-7)
Status: Passed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 231, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 42921 and 42923 of the Education Code, relating to foster youth.
Title
Foster Youth Services Coordinating Program: postsecondary education financial aid applications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 860 Beall Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB860 Beall et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB860 Beall et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 231, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5282.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-19 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18). |
2020-08-04 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | July 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3675.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 3524.) (May 12). |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 12. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 16. |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 42921 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Education Code | 42923 | Amended Code | Citation Text |