CA SB863 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-5)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - March 25 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-17 - March 25 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 11831.9 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to substance abuse programs.
Title
Alcohol and other drug abuse recovery services: advertising and marketing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | March 25 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 25. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-01-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20. |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 11831.9 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB863 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB863 |