CA SB869 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 17 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 451, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to repeal and add Section 23725 of the Government Code, and to repeal Section 46 of Chapter 53 of the Statutes of 2018, relating to elections, making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County of San Diego: local elections.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB869 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - SB 869 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 55 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB869 B. & F.R (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-17 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 451, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-17 Approved by the Governor.
2018-09-10SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
2018-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 6042.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2018-08-29AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 25. Page 6783.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-16AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2018-08-16AssemblyWithdrawn from committee.
2018-08-16AssemblyAssembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 6286.)
2018-08-14AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-07AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2018-05-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2018-05-03SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 11. Page 4928.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-01SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-30SenateOrdered to second reading.
2018-04-30SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 4865.)
2018-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2018-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2018-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code23725New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback