CA SB87 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 8879.52, 14460, 14461, 16321, and 64000 of, to add Sections 14462, 14463, and 64001 to, and to repeal Division 2 (commencing with Section 64000) of Title 6.7 of, the Government Code, to add Section 7105.1 to the Revenue and Taxation Code, and to amend Sections 5066 and 9400.4 of the Vehicle Code, relating to transportation, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 87 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 87 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING Amend By FONG Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB87 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB87 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - SB 87 B. & F. R. Senate Third Reading By TING Amend By FONG Set #1 Motion to Lay on the Table By CALDERON (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB87 B. & F.R. (Mitchell) Concurrence (Y: 32 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB87 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 32, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-06-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 32. Noes 6. Page 1600.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 59. Noes 17. Page 2304.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Amendments by Assembly Member Fong tabled on motion by Assembly Member Calderon. (Ayes 51. Noes 18. Page 2304.) |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 59. Noes 12. Page 2297.) |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 667.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.) |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-01-11 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10. |
2019-01-10 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 14460 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14461 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 14462 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 14463 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 16321 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 64000 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 64001 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 8879.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 7105.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Vehicle Code | 5066 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Vehicle Code | 9400.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |