CA SB877 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - April 1 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-18 - April 1 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 16522 and 16612 of the Government Code, relating to state fiscal affairs.
Title
Savings and loan associations or credit unions: security for deposits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 22. |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16522 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 16612 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB877 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB877 |