CA SB88 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-22 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
Pending: Assembly Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend the Budget Act of 2019 (Chapters 23 and 55 of the Statutes of 2019) by augmenting Item 9840-001-0001 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget Act of 2019: augmentation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB88 B. & F.R (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-22AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2020-06-10AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-05-02AssemblyReferred to Com. on BUDGET.
2019-04-11AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-04-11SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 667.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-04-09SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-04-08SenateOrdered to second reading.
2019-04-08SenateWithdrawn from committee. (Ayes 28. Noes 10. Page 582.)
2019-01-24SenateReferred to Com. on B. & F.R.
2019-01-11SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after February 10.
2019-01-10SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback