CA SB882 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - June 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-18 - June 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 18900.3 and 18900.4 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to CalFresh.
Title
CalFresh.
Sponsors
Sen. Scott Wiener [D] | Asm. David Chiu [D] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-18 | Senate | June 18 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3559.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2020-03-23 | Senate | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18900.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18900.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |