CA SB885 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Coms. on HEALTH, and JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Coms. on HEALTH, and JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Business, Professions and Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 4076 of the Business and Professions Code, to amend Section 120582 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 14105.181 and 14132.07 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public health.
Title
Sexually transmitted diseases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Coms. on HEALTH, and JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Set for hearing March 23. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D., HEALTH, and JUD. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4076 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 120582 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14105.181 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14132.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB885 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB885 |