CA SB886 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 455.6, 2836.1, and 9620.5 to the Public Utilities Code, relating to electricity.
Title
Electricity: energy storage systems.
Sponsors
Sen. Fran Pavley [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB886 Pavley (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB886 Pavley (Y: 25 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2016-08-10 | Assembly | August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (June 29). |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on U. & C. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 4090.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3999.) (May 27). |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | May 23 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | May 16 hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-06 | Senate | Set for hearing May 16. |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 3593.) (April 19). |
2016-04-12 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E., U., & C. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 20. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 3217 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 2836.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 454.53 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 455.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 713 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 9620.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |