CA SB886 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
Pending: Senate Governance and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 5795.10, 5796, 5796.10, and 5796.20 of the Public Resources Code, relating to parks and recreation.
Title
Parks and recreation: Lower Los Angeles River Recreation and Park District: Lower San Gabriel River Recreation and Park District: establishment: board of directors.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Archuleta [D] | Asm. Ian Calderon [D] | Asm. Cristina Garcia [D] | Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D] |
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | March 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 18. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on GOV. & F. |
2020-01-24 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 23. |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 5795.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5796 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5796.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Resources Code | 5796.20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB886 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB886 |