CA SB890 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - May 22 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-22 - May 22 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1708.84 to the Civil Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Privacy: video recording of a crime: social media.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-22 | Senate | May 22 hearing: Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 22. |
2020-03-11 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 27. |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1708.84 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB890 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB890 |