CA SB895 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on September 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 25617 of the Public Resources Code, relating to energy.
Title
Energy: zero-emission fuel, infrastructure, and transportation technologies.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 895 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Ramos (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB895 Archuleta (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-06 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB895 Archuleta (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 120, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-24 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5291.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-07 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 29 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3816.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3766.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Hearing rescheduled due to Capitol closure. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Set for hearing June 1. |
2020-05-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 3539.) (May 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | March 17 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. |
2020-01-29 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 28. |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 25617 | Amended Code | Citation Text |