CA SB897 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 4850.1 to the Labor Code, relating to workers' compensation.
Title
Workers' compensation.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Roth [D] | Sen. Jeff Stone [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-25 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB897 Roth Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 897 Roth Senate Third Reading By COOPER (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 897 Roth Senate Third Reading By HIGHER ED. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB897 Roth (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 897 Roth Senate Third Reading By COOPER (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 897 Roth Senate Third Reading By HIGHER ED. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-22 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB897 Roth (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 5423.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 2. Page 6008.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5948.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-22 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 22). |
2016-06-16 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on INS. |
2016-05-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3927.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-11 | Senate | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Roth. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3420.) (April 6). |
2016-03-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L. & I.R. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 4850.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |