CA SB899 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-18 - August 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 65913.5 to the Government Code, relating to housing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Planning and zoning: housing development: higher education institutions and religious institutions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB899 Wiener et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-18AssemblyAugust 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2020-08-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 29).
2020-07-28AssemblyJuly 28 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2020-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-25SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3862.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3766.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-27SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-26SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 3595.) (May 26).
2020-05-18SenateSet for hearing May 26.
2020-05-12SenateReferral to Coms. on EQ., and GOV. & F. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
2020-03-16SenateRe-referred to Coms. on HOUSING, EQ., and GOV. & F.
2020-03-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Com. on RLS.
2020-01-31SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1.
2020-01-30SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code65913.5New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback