CA SB9 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-08-31 - Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5496.) Ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Sections 54221, 54234, and 54237 of, and to add Sections 54237.9, 54237.10, and 54239 to, the Government Code, relating to surplus property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Surplus property: sale procedures.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 9 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Carrillo (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB9 Beall et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-29 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-31SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5496.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-09-01SenateOrdered to inactive file.
2020-08-31SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-31AssemblyRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-26AssemblyOrdered to third reading.
2020-08-26AssemblyRead third time and amended.
2020-08-26AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-08-25AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-24AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20).
2020-08-18AssemblyAugust 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
2020-08-03AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-07-30AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 29).
2020-07-28AssemblyJuly 28 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
2019-07-01AssemblyJuly 3 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
2019-05-30AssemblyReferred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and REV. & TAX.
2019-05-21AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2019-05-20SenateRead third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1162.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2019-05-16SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2019-05-16SenateFrom committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1087.) (May 16).
2019-05-10SenateSet for hearing May 16.
2019-04-29SenateApril 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2019-04-18SenateSet for hearing April 29.
2019-04-11SenateFrom committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 712.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2019-04-04SenateSet for hearing April 10.
2019-04-03SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2019-01-16SenateReferred to Com. on GOV. & F.
2018-12-04SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
2018-12-03SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Government Code54221Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code54234Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code54237Amended CodeCitation Text
Government Code54237.10New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code54237.9New CodeSee Bill Text
Government Code54239New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback