CA SB900 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 6217 of, and to add Section 6212 to, the Public Resources Code, relating to state lands.
Title
State lands: coastal hazard removal and remediation program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB900 Jackson Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 900 Jackson Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 900 Jackson Senate Third Reading By A.,E.,S.,T.,& I.M. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB900 Jackson (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-24 - Assembly - SB 900 Jackson Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS (Y: 76 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-19 - Assembly - SB 900 Jackson Senate Third Reading By A.,E.,S.,T.,& I.M. Amendment Set #1 (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB900 Jackson (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-25 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-29 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5. | |
2016-09-23 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2016-09-23 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2016-09-01 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. |
2016-08-26 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 5451.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-25 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 6238.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-19 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5971.) Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-17 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-08-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 11). |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-06-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 4084.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3999.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-25 | Senate | April 25 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 3312.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Set for hearing March 29. |
2016-03-09 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2016-01-22 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 21. |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 6212 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Resources Code | 6217 | Amended Code | Citation Text |