CA SB900 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - May 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - May 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 50.6 of, to add Article 1.5 (commencing with Section 2775) to Chapter 2 of Division 3 of, and to repeal Section 2750.3 of, the Labor Code, and to amend Section 650 of the Unemployment Insurance Code, relating to employment.
Title
Department of Industrial Relations: worker status: employees and independent contractors.
Sponsors
Sen. Jerry Hill [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | Senate | May 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-05-08 | Senate | Set for hearing May 14. |
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on L., P.E. & R. |
2020-01-31 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1. |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Labor Code | 650 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2750.3 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 2775 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Unemployment Insurance Code | 50.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB900 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB900 |