CA SB905 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 191, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 191, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 11105 and 11105.3 of the Penal Code, relating to privacy.
Title
Criminal history information requests.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB905 Archuleta Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 905 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB905 Archuleta (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 905 Archuleta Senate Third Reading By Gonzalez (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-11 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB905 Archuleta (Y: 30 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 191, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 3.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-30 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-30 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 1. Page 5287.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11). |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 3677.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3568.) (May 20). |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2020-03-26 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 31 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Set for hearing March 31. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | March 24 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | March 17 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 17. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 11105 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 11105.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |