CA SB908 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 498, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 23 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-09-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 498, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1374.21, 1385.03, 1385.07, 1385.11, and 1389.25 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 10113.9, 10181.3, 10181.7, 10181.11, and 10199.1 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Health care coverage: premium rate change: notice: other health coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-08-24 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB908 Hernandez Concurrence (Y: 25 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 908 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB908 Hernandez (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-22 - Assembly - SB 908 Hernandez Senate Third Reading By SANTIAGO (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB908 Hernandez (Y: 24 N: 12 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 498, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-09-23 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m. |
2016-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 12.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-22 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-08-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 6014.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-04 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 6.) (August 3). |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 7.) (June 28). |
2016-06-21 | Assembly | June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-06-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 4095.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-05-27 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3999.) (May 27). |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 27. |
2016-04-18 | Senate | April 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Set for hearing April 18. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 3445.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Set for hearing April 6. |
2016-03-29 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-03-28 | Senate | March 30 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2016-03-15 | Senate | Set for hearing March 30. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2016-01-27 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 26. |
2016-01-26 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 1374.21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1385.03 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1385.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1385.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1389.25 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10113.9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10181.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10181.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10181.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Insurance Code | 10199.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |