CA SB908 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1788.11 and 1788.52 of the Civil Code, and to add Division 25 (commencing with Section 100000) to the Financial Code, relating to debt collectors.
Title
Debt collectors: licensing and regulation: Debt Collection Licensing Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-31 - Assembly - SB 908 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By Limón (Y: 53 N: 19 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB908 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB908 Wieckowski (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - [06-18-2020] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB908 Wieckowski Concurrence (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB908 Wieckowski (Y: 29 N: 4 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - [06-18-2020] set for [First] hearing: Reconsideration of favorable vote granted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 163, Statutes of 2020. | |
2020-09-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2020-09-10 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 4.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-31 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 5411.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (August 20). |
2020-08-18 | Assembly | August 18 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (August 12). |
2020-08-10 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | July 27 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 4. Page 3863.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 3767.) (June 18). |
2020-06-18 | Senate | June 18 hearing: Reconsideration granted. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 3766.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 3559.) (May 19). |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2020-04-15 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Civil Code | 1788.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Civil Code | 1788.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 100000 | New Code | See Bill Text |