CA SB909 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 407, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 407, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Part 9 (commencing with Section 19501) to Division 9 of the Probate Code, relating to trusts.
Title
Uniform Trust Decanting Act.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-21 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB909 Hertzberg Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 909 Hertzberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB909 Hertzberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Assembly - SB 909 Hertzberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-08 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Do pass as amended, and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar SB909 Hertzberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 407, Statutes of 2018. | |
2018-09-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2018-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5564.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-08-16 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6310.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2018-06-13 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4879.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2018-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4625.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Set for hearing April 10. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after February 18. |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Probate Code | 19501 | New Code | See Bill Text |