CA SB912 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4439.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 28 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-29 - Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4439.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 303 and 11403 of, and to add Section 11403.07 to, the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to foster care, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Fostering Connections to Success Act.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Beall [D] | Asm. Mike Gipson [D] | Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D] | Asm. Kevin McCarty [D] |
Sen. Scott Wilk [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-08-29 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB912 Beall et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 912 Beall Third Reading Urgency By Gipson (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB912 Beall Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-26 - Assembly - SB 912 Beall Third Reading Urgency By Gipson (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-20 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-03 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB912 Beall Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-29 | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4439.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2020-09-28 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2020-09-28 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2020-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2020-08-29 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-08-28 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2020-08-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5222.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-08-20 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 20). |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-08-03 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-07-09 | Assembly | July 20 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2020-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3863.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3767.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3560.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-13 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2020-03-16 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11403 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 11403.07 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 303 | Amended Code | Citation Text |