CA SB913 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-12 - Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar.
Pending: Senate Banking and Financial Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1150, 1151, 1152, 1153, 1155, and 1157 of, to add Section 1154 to, and to repeal Section 1160 of, the Corporations Code, relating to corporations.
Title
Corporations: conversions: foreign corporation or foreign other business entity.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referral to Com. on JUD. rescinded due to the shortened 2020 Legislative Calendar. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on B. & F.I. and JUD. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 5. |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Corporations Code | 1150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 1151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 1152 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 1153 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 1154 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 1155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 1157 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Corporations Code | 1160 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB913 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB913 |