CA SB922 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-08-20 - August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 801.7 to the Penal Code, relating to criminal procedure.
Title
Criminal procedure: limitations of actions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB922 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Special Consent SB922 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-20 | Assembly | August 20 hearing: Held in committee and under submission. |
2020-08-11 | Assembly | August 11 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file. |
2020-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-07-27 | Assembly | August 3 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-06-29 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2020-06-24 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2020-06-24 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3817.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2020-06-18 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3767.) (June 18). |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2020-06-09 | Senate | June 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2020-06-03 | Senate | Set for hearing June 9. |
2020-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2020-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3569.) (May 20). |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Set for hearing May 20. |
2020-03-18 | Senate | March 24 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Set for hearing March 24. |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and APPR. |
2020-02-05 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6. |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 801.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |