CA SB924 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-09-30 - In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 340.1 of, and to add Section 340.105 to, the Code of Civil Procedure, and to amend Section 905 of the Government Code, relating to damages.
Title
Damages: childhood sexual abuse: statute of limitations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-08-27 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB924 Beall Concurrence (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 924 Beall Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB924 Beall (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-08-25 - Assembly - SB 924 Beall Senate Third Reading By SKINNER (Y: 55 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-08-14 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-05-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB924 Beall (Y: 23 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-23 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-06 - Senate - Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-30 | In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2014-09-30 | Vetoed by the Governor. | |
2014-09-04 | Senate | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2014-08-27 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 22. Noes 11. Page 4916.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2014-08-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2014-08-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 19. Page 6410.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2014-08-18 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (August 14). |
2014-07-02 | Assembly | Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2014-06-17 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (June 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-06-11 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-06-05 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2014-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2014-05-28 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 3654.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2014-05-23 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3705.) (May 23). |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Set for hearing May 23. |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Set for hearing May 19. |
2014-05-13 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2014-05-12 | Senate | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3403.) (May 6). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and APPR. |
2014-01-30 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 1. |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Code of Civil Procedure | 340.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Code of Civil Procedure | 340.105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Government Code | 905 | Amended Code | Citation Text |