CA SB924 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - March 25 hearing postponed by committee.
Pending: Senate Labor, Public Employment and Retirement Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An act to amend Section 4610 of the Labor Code, relating to workers’ compensation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Workers’ compensation: utilization review.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-18SenateMarch 25 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-11SenateSet for hearing March 25.
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Com. on L., P.E. & R.
2020-02-05SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
2020-02-04SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Labor Code4610Amended CodeCitation Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback