CA SB932 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on September 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-26 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

An act to add Section 120255 to the Health and Safety Code, relating to communicable diseases, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Communicable diseases: data collection.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-30 - Assembly - SB 932 Wiener Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-30 - Senate - Unfinished Business SB932 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-04 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SB932 Wiener et al. Urgency Clause (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-13 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-26 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 183, Statutes of 2020.
2020-09-26 Approved by the Governor.
2020-09-08SenateEnrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
2020-08-30SenateAssembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2020-08-30SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-08-30SenateIn Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
2020-08-30AssemblyRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5283.) Ordered to the Senate.
2020-08-20AssemblyRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2020-08-19AssemblyRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-08-18AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 18).
2020-08-06AssemblyRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-08-05AssemblyFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 4).
2020-07-27AssemblyFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-06-29AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-06-25AssemblyIn Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
2020-06-25SenateRead third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 3842.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2020-06-25SenateOrdered to special consent calendar.
2020-06-22SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2020-06-18SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
2020-06-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3767.) (June 18).
2020-06-11SenateSet for hearing June 18.
2020-06-09SenateJune 9 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
2020-06-03SenateSet for hearing June 9.
2020-05-28SenateJune 1 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-05-26SenateSet for hearing June 1.
2020-05-19SenateRead second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2020-05-18SenateFrom committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3533.) (May 13).
2020-05-11SenateSet for hearing May 13.
2020-05-05SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-03-17SenateMarch 25 hearing postponed by committee.
2020-03-06SenateSet for hearing March 25.
2020-02-12SenateReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2020-02-06SenateFrom printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
2020-02-05SenateIntroduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.

Code Citations

ChapterSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Health and Safety Code120255New CodeSee Bill Text

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback