CA SB936 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-03 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-04-03 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
Pending: Senate Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Sections 14087.302 and 14197.25 to the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal.
Title
Medi-Cal managed care plans: contracts.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Pan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-03 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-03-20 | Senate | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-03-17 | Senate | April 1 hearing postponed by committee. |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Set for hearing April 1. |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2020-02-07 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 8. |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14087.302 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14197.25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB936 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201920200SB936 |